California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:22-cv-05831
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2023 7:24 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
ATV Canter, LLC
Plaintiff
Leemanuel Weilch
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ara A. Tchaghlassian
Terminated: 01/04/2023


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
30 30 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 03/31 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/20 12:56 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 30 days. The Court sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for April 24, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a notice of dismissal is filed by noon on April 20, 2023. (aco)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Settlement Mon 03/20 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/23 3:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT by Judge George H. Wu. Based on the stipulation of the parties and for good cause shown: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the default entered against Defendant ATV CANTER, LLC is set aside. Defendant has thirty (30) days to file and serve its responsive pleading. RE: Stipulation to Set Aside Default25 . (aco)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Default Judgment ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/23 2:58 PM
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT19 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion19 was issued on February 23, 202323 . Court confers with Plaintiff's counsel. For reasons stated on the record, the stipulation to set aside the default is granted. Separate order to issue. Plaintiff's Motion is deemed MOOT. However, the Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. The Court sets a status conference for March 23, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status report by noon on March 21, 2023.; finding as moot19 MOTION for Default Judgment. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
25 25 stip Set Aside Default Tue 02/21 3:20 PM
STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Defendant ATV CANTER, LLC filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch.(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/21 10:31 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Due to the expiration of the CARES ACT in the Central District of California, the Motion Hearing19 , set for Thursday, February 23, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in-person and not by telephone. Masks are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 02/21 10:10 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - TENTATIVE RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT19 by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion19 set for hearing on February 23, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 01/20 11:53 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: There is presently a status conference in this matter set for January 23, 2023. Plaintiff has filed a motion for default judgment which is set to be heard on February 23, 2023 (see ECF No.19 ). In light thereof, the January 23 status conference is taken off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/19 10:11 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 01/23/2023 status conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
20 20 misc Status Report Wed 01/18 4:33 PM
STATUS REPORT OSC re: Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Default Judgment Wed 01/18 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant ATV CANTER, LLC filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Proof of Service
Thursday, January 05, 2023
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/05 10:52 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a STATUS CONFERENCE for 1/23/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Plaintiff is to file a status report by noon on 01/19/2023. /THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 01/05 9:36 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ATV Canter, LLC (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 01/04 10:53 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant ATV Canter, LLC filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 01/04 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Ara A. Tchaghlassian. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 01/04 10:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch, upon Defendant ATV Canter, LLC served on 10/21/2022, answer due 11/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo C/O CT Corporation System, as agent for service of process, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 12/20 11:51 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than January 4, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details) (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 10/13 10:47 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition10 as to Defendant ATV Canter, LLC. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
11 11 notice Summons Request Wed 10/12 12:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition10 filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 10/12 12:47 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant ATV Canter, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
9 9 10 pgs order Order Thu 08/18 11:32 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/17 3:55 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Ara A. Tchaghlassian. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 08/17 3:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/17 3:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/17 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 08/17 2:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/17 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 08/17 2:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/17 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-33828756 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Leemanuel Weilch(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]