Dixon v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02707 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 4:22-cv-00486 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 12, 2023 10:38 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Shawn L. Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/24 12:58 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
12 | 12 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western, 4:22-cv-00486, Dixon v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2707-RMG (sshe, ) | |
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 08/17 3:16 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:22-cv-00486. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-100, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to District of South Carolina to be included in MDL No. 2873. Signed on 8/15/2022. Case electronically transferred. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed on 8/5/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER. The parties' stipulation5 is STRUCK. The parties are not able to stipulate to their own deadline to file an answer. The parties are nonetheless free to file a motion to stay pending a decision by the MDL. Signed on 8/4/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. With his consent, the Court transfers this case to the Honorable David Gregory Kays for all further proceedings. Signed on July 29, 2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Kern, Kendra) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Case reassigned to District Judge Greg Kays for all further proceedings. District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey no longer assigned to case This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | ||
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendant Chemguard, Inc..(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2216-CV13794, filed by Kara T Stubbs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8037186.(Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/17/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court File |