Moore et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02803 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 8:10 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leon Riley Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margie E Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leon Riley Moore(Patel, Shreedhar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (A). Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiff Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28 | ||
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/22/2022), Moore et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2803-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Texas (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/23 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 08/23 9:15 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/22/2022), Moore et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2803-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Texas (sshe, ) |
||
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/23 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10658881.), filed by Leon Riley Moore, Margie E Moore. Service due by 11/21/2022(sshe, ) |