Walsh v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02837 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 to 100
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Hallie Walsh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/29 10:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hallie Walsh(Shafer, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 26, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/25/2022), Walsh v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2837-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: North Carolina (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/26 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/26 10:08 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/25/2022), Walsh v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2837-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: North Carolina (sshe, ) |
||
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/26 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10665182.), filed by Hallie Walsh. Service due by 11/23/2022(sshe, ) |