USA v. Holloway
Delaware District Court | |
Case #: | 1:22-cr-00086 |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 26, 2022 3:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jasmine Holloway (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/26/2022 4:17 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
SO ORDERED Granting1 Motion to Seal The Case File as to Sealed Defendant (1). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/8/22. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
1 | 1 MOTION to Seal The Case File by USA as to Sealed Defendant. (kjk) (kjk). [1:22-mj-00200] | |
2 | 2 SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by U.S. Postal Inspector, sworn to before Judge Sherry R. Fallon as to Sealed Defendant (1). (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
Arrest of Sealed Defendant. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance as to Sealed Defendant held on 6/9/2022 ; Deft. was present with counsel ( Conor Wilson, Esq., from the FPD's Office was appointed ); Court advised counsel of their Brady obligations; Govt. recommended that the Deft be released on an O/R Bail; Granted; Deft. ordered released on her Own Recognizance with special conditions; Preliminary Hearing set for 6/30/22 at 1:00 pm before Judge Burke. ATTENDEES: AUSA - C. Hudson, Esq.; DEFT - C. Wilson, Esq.; USPO - V. Hislop, Esq.; CLERK - Kincaid. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
Set Hearings as to Sealed Defendant: A Preliminary Hearing is set for 6/30/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
3 | 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Sealed Defendant; Appointment of Eleni Kousoulis, Esq., for Sealed Defendant. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/9/22. (kjk) (kjk). [1:22-mj-00200] | |
4 | 4 ORDER pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Sealed Defendant. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/9/22. (kjk) (kjk). [1:22-mj-00200] | |
5 | 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Sealed Defendant (1) Own Recognizance with special conditions. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/9/22. (kjk) (kjk). [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
CRIMINAL COMPLAINT unsealed as to Jasmine Holloway. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
SO ORDERED Granting7 Motion to Unseal The Case File as to Jasmine Holloway (1). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/10/22. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
Case unsealed as to Jasmine Holloway. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
6 | 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/9/22 in case as to Sealed Defendant. (kjk) (kjk). [1:22-mj-00200] | |
7 | 7 MOTION to Unseal The Case File by USA as to Jasmine Holloway. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
8 | 8 REDACTED VERSION of 2 Criminal Complaint (Sealed) by USA as to Jasmine Holloway. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Conor Wilson appearing for Jasmine Holloway (Wilson, Conor) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Preliminary Hearing as to Jasmine Holloway was set to be held on 6/30/2022. Defendant was present with Counsel. Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Waiver signed. Counsel for Defendant made Oral Motion to Amend the Conditions of Release. Without objections, the Court grants the Oral Motion and signed an Order Amending the Conditions of Release. (Clerk, D. Benyo) APPEARANCES: C.Hudson for Government; C. Wilson for FPD; A. Ramirez for USPO. (dlb) [1:22-mj-00200] | ||
10 | 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jasmine Holloway (dlb) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Jasmine Holloway. (Hudson, Carly) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
12 | 12 ORDER as to Jasmine Holloway GRANTING11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict. ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice re11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict. Time is excluded from 7/6/2022 until 8/8/2022. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/6/2022. (lih) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
13 | 13 Second MOTION to Exclude Time Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Jasmine Holloway. (Hudson, Carly) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER Granting13 Motion to Exclude as to Jasmine Holloway (1); Time excluded from8/8/2022 until 9/7/2022. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/4/22. (kjk) [1:22-mj-00200] | |
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
15 | 15 FELONY INFORMATION as to Jasmine Holloway (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (kjk) | |
Att: 1 Defendant Information Sheet |