Guang Zhou Sheng Wei Dian Zi Shang Wu You Xian Gong Si v. The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Referred: | Patrick M Hunt |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-61622 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2023 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Defaulting Defendants Listed in Exhibit A
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maomohou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guang Zhou Sheng Wei Dian Zi Shang Wu You Xian Gong Si
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Cimiva
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dingren
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hejing
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ningzhi
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
POETIC SENTIMENT
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Qianmian
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
QingCheng
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Un Poco Loco
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xingmian
Terminated: 11/23/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
the Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Amended Schedule A
Terminated: 09/29/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Terminated: 01/20/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
83 | 83
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Release of Funds
Thu 02/02 3:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELEASE BOND: ORDER granting81 Motion for Release of Funds. The Clerk of Court shall RELEASE the $10,000.00 bond posted by or on behalf of Guang Zhou Sheng Wei Dian Zi Shang Wu You Xian Gong Si, along with any accrued interest, to Jared W. Gasman Attorney, P.A. 5353 N. Federal Highway, Suite 402, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
82 | 82
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Wed 02/01 8:55 AM
Clerks Receipt for REGISTRY DEPOSIT received on 10/6/2022 in the amount of $10,000.00 deposited by Jared W. Gasman PA per Order of the Court DE#18, receipt number 16108. (jcs) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
81 | 81
motion
Release of Funds
Mon 01/30 10:21 PM
MOTION for Release of Funds by Guang Zhou Sheng Wei Dian Zi Shang Wu You Xian Gong Si.(Palmer, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |