Louisiana Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00181
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2022 2:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Mark Amos (1)
Represented By
Claude J. Kelly
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Frank G. DeSalvo
Frank G. Desalvo, Aplc
contact info
Julie Christine Tizzard
Julie C. Tizzard, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maurice Landrieu
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/11/2022 2:41 AM CDT
Thursday, August 04, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault as to Mark Amos (1). (cms) (cc: USM) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Magistrate Case Sheet
3 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Complaint, Affidavit, and Arrest Warrant by USA as to Mark Amos. (cms) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Complaint, Affidavit, and Arrest Warrant as to Mark Amos (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/4/2022. (cms) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
5 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Mark Amos. Motion(s) referred to Duty Magistrate. (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Mark Amos (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/8/2022. (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas: Initial Appearance as to Mark Amos held on 8/8/2022. Defendant remanded. Detention Hearing set for 8/10/2022 02:00 PM before Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/22/2022 02:00 PM before Duty Magistrate. (Court Reporter Crim Mag.) (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Mark Amos. Claude J. Kelly for Mark Amos appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/8/2022. (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mark Amos. (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
11 11 PRETRIAL BAIL REPORT as to Mark Amos. NOTE: The attached document will only be accessible to the criminal duty judge, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant for bail determination proceedings. After the proceedings are completed, only Probation will have access. (Robert, Cheryl) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas: Detention Hearing as to Mark Amos held on 8/10/2022. Defendant remanded. Added attorney Frank Gerald DeSalvo, Jr. for Mark Amos. Attorney Claude J. Kelly terminated as to Mark Amos. (Court Reporter Crim Mag.) (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Mark Amos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/10/2022. (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Mark Amos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/10/2022. (ft) [2:22-mj-00103-DM]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Mark Amos (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4. (jls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Magistrate Case Sheet,
Att: 2 Criminal Defendant Information Sheet