Sterling et al v. The City of Jackson, Mississippi et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi H Johnson |
Referred: | Michael T Parker |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00531 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 15, 2023 3:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Chokwe A. Lumumba
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kishia Powell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Siemens Industry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jerriot Smash
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Jackson, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trilogy Engineering Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tony Yarber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raine Becker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Priscilla Sterling
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Siemens Corporation
Terminated: 12/22/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
appeal
Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted
Thu 08/01 10:49 AM
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL 24-60370 ACCEPTED : The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download at[LINK:http://http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf] using credentials provided to you by the Clerk of that Court. COUNSEL MUST HAVE AN APPEARANCE FORM ON FILE. If you have not filed it and/or have just filed it, please allow 3-5 days for processing. Requirements: Java 1.7, Adobe Acrobat Reader 11, turn off pop up blockers or add CM/ECF filing system to approved pop up settings. Pro Se Parties should request the record from the Clerks Office. (LAT) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Thu 07/25 3:49 PM
Certified and Electronically Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals and awaiting on acceptance from USCA re121 Notice of Appeal. Parties will be notified once the record has been accepted. (LAT) |