Warnock v. Capital City Traffic Control LLC et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lee P Rudofsky |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00869 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 19, 2023 3:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Capital City Traffic Control LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jay Muniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Warnock
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/06 9:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal , Joint by Dustin Warnock. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 2:58 PM
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/12/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/13/2023. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/15/2023. (hml) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order
Tue 08/15 1:59 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: In light of Doc.25 Notice of Settlement, the Court is pushing the trial date and all pretrial deadlines by three months. A new scheduling order is forthcoming. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 8/15/2023. (hml) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Pretrial Disclosure Sheet
Mon 08/14 4:30 PM
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET Defendants' Pretrial Disclosure Sheet by Capital City Traffic Control LLC, Jay Muniz. (Taylor, Brett) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 08/14 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement , Joint by Dustin Warnock (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/15 1:29 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Capital City Traffic Control LLC, Jay Muniz. (Taylor, Brett) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 03/21 4:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct21 Scheduling Order, Motion for Amended Scheduling Order by Capital City Traffic Control LLC, Jay Muniz (Taylor, Brett) |
|
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/21 11:35 AM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (kdr) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/06 3:03 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial reset for 9/12/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Discovery due by 5/1/2023; Motions due by 5/15/2023; Status Report due by 5/15/2023; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 8/14/2023. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/6/2023. (hml) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 02/28 1:25 PM
ORDER re13 Motion for Order: Defendants do not seek a full discovery period. They ask for enough time to propound 1 set of written discovery, get the answers, and then after that depose Plaintiff. The Court believes the parties should be able to accomplish all of those activities within 60 days. The Court will set the discovery period accordingly. Within this discovery period, Plaintiff may conduct discovery as well. The dispositive-motions deadline will be set for 2 weeks after the close of discovery. And trial will be set for approximately 4 months after the dispositive-motions deadline. A final scheduling order will be issued shortly. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/28/2023. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 02/21 11:11 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION for Order -- Motion for Order Setting Trial -- Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Setting Trial filed by Dustin Warnock. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Fri 02/17 4:55 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a reply to13 Motion for Order Setting Trial by Wednesday, February 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/17/2023. (hml) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 02/17 8:41 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION for Order -- Motion for Order Setting Trial filed by All Defendants. (Taylor, Brett) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 02/13 5:10 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Defendants are directed to respond to13 Motion for Order Setting Trial by Friday, February 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/13/2023. (hml) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Mon 02/13 8:05 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Capital City Traffic Control LLC (Taylor, Brett) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Deficiency Letter
Fri 02/10 4:25 PM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re11 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
motion
Order
Wed 02/08 11:51 AM
MOTION for Order -- Motion for Order Setting Trial by Dustin Warnock (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 12/12 2:55 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/6/2023 and Bench Trial set for 3/19/2024 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/12/2022. (hml) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 12/12 8:51 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Capital City Traffic Control LLC, Jay Muniz.(Taylor, Brett) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 11/18 4:09 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lydia Hicks Hamlet terminated. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/18/2022. (hml) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 11/18 3:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney -Lydia H. Hamlet by Dustin Warnock (Hamlet, Lydia) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/18 8:18 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to4 Plaintiff's First Amended and Substituted Complaint. Response due by 12/12/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/18/2022. (hml) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 11/17 2:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 Amended Complaint by All Defendants (Taylor, Brett) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/31 9:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Warnock. Jay Muniz served on 10/30/2022. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/31 9:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Warnock. Capital City Traffic Control LLC served on 10/30/2022. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/05 2:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -- First Amended and Substituted Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Dustin Warnock(Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Notice of Related Case
Thu 09/29 11:17 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER approving2 Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 9/29/2022. (hml) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Notice of Related Case
Tue 09/20 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Related Case by Dustin Warnock; Case Number 4:19-cv-813-LPR. (ldb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/20 3:43 PM
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed by Dustin Warnock against Capital City Traffic Control LLC and Jay Muniz. ( Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT088365.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (ldb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |