USA v. 216,200.00 in US Currency et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00866 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 19, 2023 3:47 AM CDT |
Claimant
Jeremy Green
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
$1,001.00 in US Currency
|
|
Defendant
$216,200.00 in US Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 04 2022
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AS TO CLAIMANT JEREMY GREEN and granting 3 joint motion. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/04/2022. (llg) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Wed 11/01 2:31 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge James M. Moody Jr.. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/1/2023. (jbh) |
||
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 11/04 10:34 AM
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AS TO CLAIMANT JEREMY GREEN and granting3 joint motion. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/04/2022. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Stay
Wed 11/02 3:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Stay Forfeiture Proceedings as to Claimant Jeremy Green by USA (McCree, Cameron) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
respoth
Claim
Mon 10/31 4:28 PM
VERIFIED Claim by Jeremy Green. (jap) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/20 3:14 PM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against All Defendants, filed by USA. Warrant issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) |