Raynham Center Water District v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03051 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11375 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 11, 2023 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kiddie P.L.C., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/19 12:22 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hcor, ) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/07 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J Julius on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Julius, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/03 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Philip) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/03 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cossich, Christina) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/03 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/03 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, City of Fairborn, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Smith, Luana) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/30 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/29 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Burke Pickrel, Carla) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/29 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of Town of Uxbridge, North Raynham Water District, Town of Millis, Town of Avon, Town of Chatham, RAYNHAM CENTER WATER DISTRICT, Lunenburg Water District Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McDougal, Cary) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-11375, Raynham Center Water District v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3051-RMG (sshe, ) | |
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 09/20 1:44 PM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:22-cv-11375. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/8/2022. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
10 | 10 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 103 in MDL Case 2873 received from District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 STATE COURT Record. (Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
7 | 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(MacDonald, Gail) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
6 | 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Assented-to Motion for an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint. The time for all defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to twenty-eight (28) days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") issues its decision on the anticipated motion by Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. (collectively, "Tyco") to seek transfer of this action to MDL No. 2873. Tyco shall file status reports here every thirty days advising the court when the anticipated motion has been filed with the JPML and reporting on further developments through resolution of the anticipated motion. (Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Friday, August 26, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Filing by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Jeffrey, Jessica) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/26/2022) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Jeffrey, Jessica) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/26/2022) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9469640 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Jeffrey, Jessica) (Main Document and all attachments replaced on 8/26/2022 with corrected documents.) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/20/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |