Obeslo v. Empower Capital, et al
Original Case: 1:16-cv-00230
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01292 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 01, 2023 7:01 AM MDT |
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CONSUMER ADVOCATES
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Attorney - Appellant
SCHLICHTER BOGARD & DENTON LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREAT-WEST LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE CO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREAT-WEST CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREAT-WEST LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE CO.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
EMPOWER ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREAT-WEST CAPTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
EMPOWER CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOAN OBESLO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANNE HALL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TINA GORRELL-DEYERLE, on behalf of Great-Western Funds, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/01/2023 7:01 AM MDT |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
[10941463] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/16/2022 Docketing statement due 10/03/2022 for Schlichter Bogard & Denton LLP. Transcript order form due 10/03/2022 for Schlichter Bogard & Denton LLP. Notice of appearance due on 10/03/2022 for Great-West Capital Management, LLC, Great-West Life and Annuity Insurance Co and Schlichter Bogard & Denton LLP. 22-1292 | ||
Att: 1 28 pgs Prelm ROA | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |