Cowden, et al v. Board of Governors for the Colorado State, et al
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03197
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01293 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2022 1:32 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellant
BOARD OF GOVERNORS FOR THE COLORADO STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM, by and through Colorado State University-Pueblo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
WILLIAM FOLKESTAD, in his individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MOHAMED ABDELRAHMAN, in his individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
TIMOTHY MOTTET, in his individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KIMBERLY COWDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOANNE GULA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/21/2022 1:32 AM MST |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
[10941572] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/19/2022. Docketing statement due 10/03/2022 for Mohamed Abdelrahman, Board of Governors for the Colorado State University System, William Folkestad and Timothy Mottet. Transcript order form due 10/03/2022 for Mohamed Abdelrahman, Board of Governors for the Colorado State University System, William Folkestad and Timothy Mottet. Notice of appearance due on 10/03/2022 for Mohamed Abdelrahman, Board of Governors for the Colorado State University System, Kimberly Cowden, William Folkestad, Joanne Gula and Timothy Mottet 22-1293 | ||
Att: 1 46 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |