M., et al v. United Behavioral Health, et al
Original Case: 2:18-cv-00808
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-04086 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 1:36 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN FOR ACTIVE PARTICIPANTS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANNE M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
E. W.-M.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/25/2023 1:36 AM MST |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
[10941600] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/19/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/03/2022 for Anne M., David W. and E. W.-M. Notice of appearance also due on 10/03/2022 for Motion Picture Industry Health Plan for Active Participants and United Behavioral Health 22-4086 | ||
Att: 1 40 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |