Greene v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00385
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01296 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 06, 2022 2:29 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CEDRIC GREENE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 04 2022
[10945179] Dismissed for failure to prosecute, 10th Cir. R. 42.1. Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [22-1296] |
Docket last updated: 10/06/2022 2:29 AM MDT |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
[10941655] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/19/2022 Notice of appearance due on 10/19/2022 for Cedric Greene. 22-1296 | ||
Att: 1 10 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se | ||
1 pgs [10941691] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on its own initiative following the opening of this appeal. Pro se appellant is subject to filing restrictions. On or before October 3, 2022, the appellant shall file all documents required by the filing restrictions applicable to him and this civil appeal. See order for details. Response due on 10/03/2022 for Cedric Greene. Served on 09/19/2022. 22-1296 | ||
3 pgs [10941732] Miscellaneous correspondence received from Mr. Cedric Greene but not filed. [22-1296 |