USA v. Mohamed
Original Case: 3:21-cr-00310
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-dcrim-10893 |
Type | criminal (dcrim) / direct criminal |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2022 3:05 PM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Abutalib Mohamed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 23 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-10893 Affirmed ] Judge: PR , Judge: JEG , Judge: CTW Mandate issue date is 03/18/2024 for Appellant Abutalib Mohamed [22-10893] |
Docket last updated: 09/21/2022 3:05 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
2 pgs DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Abutalib Mohamed 22-10893 (AS) | ||
4 pgs JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW COMPLETE. Awaiting ruling on motion to withdraw and appoint new counsel. 22-10893 (AS) | ||
2
pgs
CJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Mr. Hugo Aguilar for Mr. Abutalib Mohamed. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: NTX ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 3:21-CR-310 DEFENDANT NUMBER: 1 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 09/19/2022 22-10893 (AS) |