Jackson v. BP Expl & Prod
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcd-30592 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2023 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BP America Production Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BP, P.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Holdings, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Deepwater, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Marcus Carnell Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/23/2023 3:21 AM CDT |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Marcus Carnell Jackson 22-30592 (AGL) |