Port Cargo Svc v. Westchester Surplus
Original Case: 2:22-cv-01018
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcd-30594 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 08, 2022 2:28 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Port Cargo Services, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Burnside Plantation, L.L.C., doing business as Houmas House
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/08/2022 2:28 AM CST |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Burnside Plantation, L.L.C. and Port Cargo Services, L.L.C. 22-30594 (AGL) |