Webster v. Doe
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Referred: | Jerome T Kearney |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00245 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/28 1:55 PM
NOTICE by Gary Leon Webster. (wbb) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/29 2:55 PM
NOTICE by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Wed 10/18 8:56 AM
Letter from Clerk, USCA: The Petition for Writ of Certiorari has been denied by the United States Supreme Court in USCA Case Number 23-1349 (jbh) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Fri 08/18 2:45 PM
Letter from Clerk, USCA: The Petition for Writ of Certiorari has been filed in USCA Case Number 23-1349 (jbh) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 05/30 8:27 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh) |
|
22 | 22
order
Judgment 1983
Tue 05/30 8:23 AM
JUDGMENT: Webster's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/26/2023. (jbh) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 05/30 8:16 AM
ORDER directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $505 appellate filing fee; adopting4 recommendation; overruling Webster's5 ,6 ,16 objections; denying1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing Webster's complaint without prejudice; denying without prejudice as moot3 motion for return of seized property and18 motion for estoppel; and directing Webster to pay the $402 filing and administrative fees and file a motion to reopen the case by 6/12/2023 if he wants to pursue this case. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/26/2023. (jbh) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 05/18 11:10 AM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 4/3/2023 as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 05/08 11:52 AM
ORDER of USCA as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster: The petition for rehearing by the panel is denied. (jbh) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 04/24 4:28 PM
MOTION for Estoppel by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Judgment
Mon 04/03 11:57 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster: This appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied as moot. The full $505 appellate and docketing fees are assessed against the appellant. The court remands the collection of those fees to the district court. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Objections
Wed 03/01 2:11 PM
OBJECTION by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 02/23 12:49 PM
ORDER of USCA as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster: The district court has determined that Appellant has three "strikes" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 3/27/2023. (jbh) |
|
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Docketing Letter
Thu 02/23 12:41 PM
USCA Docketing Letter as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster. USCA Case Number 23-1349 (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Wed 02/22 12:50 PM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to7 Notice of Appeal. (jbh) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 02/22 12:45 PM
ORDER denying11 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis; and certifying that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/2023. (jbh) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Appeal Deficiency Notice
Mon 11/28 8:21 AM
APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE re7 Notice of Appeal,8 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (jbh) |
|
Friday, November 25, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/28 3:47 PM
NOTICE by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/12 12:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 10/25 12:20 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. Response due by 11/25/2022. (jbh) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 10/25 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Gary Leon Webster. (jbh) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 10/25 10:01 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 10/17 4:55 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/29 4:31 PM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending:1 Plaintiff's IFP Motion be DENIED.2 Plaintiff Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to continue this case, he be required to submit the statutory filing and administrative fee of $402.00 to the Clerk, noting the above case style and number, within 15 days of the date of this Order, together with a motion to reopen the case. Upon receipt of the motion and full payment, the case will be reopened.3 Plaintiff's Motion for Return of Seized Property be DENIED as moot. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections are due to be received by the Clerk of this Court within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/29/2022. (lmc) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Return of Property
Wed 09/21 1:24 PM
MOTION for Return of Seized Property by Gary Leon Webster. (llg) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/21 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Doe filed by Gary Leon Webster. (llg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 09/21 1:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (llg) |