Williams v. Yates
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00171 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2022 |
Defendant
John P Yates
|
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Williams
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 12/19 4:22 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Frederick Williams re3 Order,4 Judgment,5 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Wed 12/07 11:59 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judgment 1983
Wed 12/07 11:57 AM
JUDGMENT: Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/07/2022. (llg) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/07 11:16 AM
ORDER withdrawing the reference. Plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/2022. (jak) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/22 12:30 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose a new IFP application, along with a copy of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/22/2022. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Writ of Mandamus
Wed 09/21 5:05 PM
EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Mandamus by Frederick Williams. (kdr) |