Valdez, et al v. Lujan Grisham, et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00783
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02112 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 22, 2022 2:19 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MICHELLE LUJAN GRISHAM, Officially and Individually, acting under the color of law
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID SCRASE, officially and Individually, acting under the color of law
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TALISHA VALDEZ, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JENNIFER BLACKFORD, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/22/2022 2:19 AM MDT |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
[10941863] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/20/2022. Docketing statement due 10/04/2022 for Jennifer Blackford and Talisha Valdez. Transcript order form due 10/04/2022 for Jennifer Blackford and Talisha Valdez. Notice of appearance due on 10/04/2022 for Jennifer Blackford, Michelle Lujan Grisham, David Scrase, and Talisha Valdez 22-2112 | ||
Att: 1 46 pgs Prelim ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |