Kane County, et al v. United States, et al
Original Case: 2:10-cv-01073
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-04087 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2024 3:33 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant Intervenor - Appellant
SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant Intervenor - Appellant
SIERRA CLUB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant Intervenor - Appellant
THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant Intervenor - Appellant
GRAND CANYON TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KANE COUNTY, UTAH, a Utah political subdivision
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Intervenor - Appellee
STATE OF UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/05/2024 3:33 AM MST |
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
[10942009] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/20/2022. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 10/04/2022 for Grand Canyon Trust, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance and The Wilderness Society. Notice of appearance due on 10/04/2022 for Kane County, Utah, State of Utah and United States of America. 22-4087 | ||
Att: 1 162 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |