Robert Torres v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:22-cv-81474 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:22-cv-06220 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 7:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Fremont, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does
1-100, inclusive 251 174th Street
Miami Beach, FL 33160 |
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Torres
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
order
Administrative Order
Wed 09/28 10:13 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. All pending motions are the above-listed cases are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the movant to comply with the procedures outlined in Pretrial Order # 24, paragraph 10. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
19 | 19 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) | |
18 | 18
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 09/22 7:55 AM
Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:22-cv-06220. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 09/22 8:20 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
||
Wednesday, September 21, 2022 | ||
17 | 17 Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-101 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rolm) | |
Thursday, September 15, 2022 | ||
16 | 16 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER re DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The contact information for attorney Katelyn P Dembowski is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket. If you are counsel of record in a case currently pending in this district and you need to update your business or contact information, you must file and serve Form G-06 ("Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information") in each of your pending cases. Doing so will satisfy your notice obligation under Local Rule 83-2.4. In addition, if you are a registered CM/ECF User, you must log in to your CM/ECF account and update your information directly in the CM/ECF System. See Local Rule 5-4.8.1. (aco) | |
15 | 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 10/17/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) | |
14 | 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) | |
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
13 | 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Andrew T. Bayman on behalf of Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) | |
12 | 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-03793 SVW(PVCx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-06220 SVW(PVCx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (rn) | |
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-05296-SVW-PVC (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-06220 MWF(AGRx). (rn) | |
9 | 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew T. Bayman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) | |
8 | 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 09/01/2022. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
7 | 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) | |
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., identifying Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Blaschke, Matthew) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, case number 21STCV32491 Receipt No: ACACDC-33910437 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew James Blaschke added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Blaschke, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint & Filings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Karen Kramer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Sanofi Acquisition | ||
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Fremont, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Walmart, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Robert Torres. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/1/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |