Ponder v. Hire Quest LLC et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Referred: | Kaymani D West |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03233 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hire Quest LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyrone L Ponder, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/21 10:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc. (Spence, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Wed 12/07 9:25 AM
Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Hire Quest LLC (Mittel, David). Modified on 12/7/2022 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ) |
|
21 | 21
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 12/07 9:24 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Hire Quest LLC (Mittel, David). Modified on 12/7/2022 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/06 2:18 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/28/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/27/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/27/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/29/2023, Discovery due by 5/29/2023, Motions due by 7/28/2023, Mediation Due by 6/30/2023. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial the later of 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or October 27, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/6/2022. (prou, ) |
|
19 | 19
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Tue 12/06 1:10 PM
Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc.(Spence, Melissa) |
|
18 | 18
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 12/06 1:02 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc.(Spence, Melissa) |
|
17 | 17
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 12/06 1:01 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc.(Spence, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Amended Conference and Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 12/05 10:47 AM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Tyrone L Ponder, Jr.(Wigger, Jarrel) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 11/09 12:12 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc.(Spence, Melissa) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/09 12:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc.(Spence, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Mediation Order
Wed 11/02 10:16 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 4/28/2023. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/2/2022. (prou, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/02 10:14 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/28/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/7/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 12/7/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/28/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/27/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/27/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/27/2023, Discovery due by 4/28/2023, Motions due by 5/30/2023, Mediation Due by 4/28/2023. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial the later of 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or August 28, 2023. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/2/2022. (prou, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 11/01 1:18 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hire Quest LLC.(Evans, Kelly) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/01 1:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Hire Quest LLC.(Evans, Kelly) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Mon 10/17 2:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyrone L Ponder, Jr. Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022; Hire Quest LLC served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022.(Wigger, Jarrel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/22 4:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc, Hire Quest LLC. (prou, ) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 09/22 4:34 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Tyrone L Ponder, Jr.(prou, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/22 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Gulf Stream Construction Company Inc, Hire Quest LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10714171.), filed by Tyrone L Ponder, Jr. Service due by 12/21/2022.(prou, ) |