Bennett v. Dyson Inc
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Billy Roy Wilson |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00875 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Lonoke County Circuit Court, 43-CV-22-00383 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dyson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
La Quita Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 02/08 1:17 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/8/23. (mmb) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/27 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by La Quita Bennett (Slade, David) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 11/16 9:33 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting16 the Joint Motion to Stay. This case is STAYED until the Eighth Circuit issues a ruling in Leflar v. Target Corporation , 4:22-cv-00727. After that case is resolved on appeal, the parties must file a motion to lift stay. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/16/22. (dmm) |
|
Friday, November 11, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stay
Fri 11/11 4:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Eighth Circuit Review of Target v. Leflar Petition by La Quita Bennett (Slade, David) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Wed 11/09 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re15 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the Jury trial date as 4/6/2024 as marked on the Order. (jak) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 11/07 11:52 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/17/2023. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/30/2023. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2024 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 11/7/22. (mmb) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Reassignment
Fri 11/04 4:30 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to13 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/04 4:30 PM
ORDER originally filed in case 4:22-cv-00686 KGB directing the Clerk of Court to transfer immediately the case, and all cases listed on Courts Exhibit A attached hereto, to Judge Wilson. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/4/2022. (jak) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 10/27 9:23 AM
ORDER granting9 ,10 ,11 motions for admission pro hac vice. Allison W. Buchner, Leonora Cohen, and Robyn E. Bladow shall appear as counsel for defendant Dyson, Inc. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/27/2022. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/26 3:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by ROBYN E. BLADOW. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4380810. Filed by Dyson Inc (Doan, Darby) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/26 3:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by LEONORA COHEN. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4380807. Filed by Dyson Inc (Doan, Darby) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/26 3:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by ALLISON W. BUCHNER. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4380801. Filed by Dyson Inc (Doan, Darby) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 10/18 9:53 AM
ORDER granting7 motion for extension of time. Dyson has up to and including 12/5/2022, to respond to Ms. Bennett's complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/2022. (jbh) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 10/07 4:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Dyson Inc (Doan, Darby) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 09/28 9:57 AM
ORDER granting5 unopposed motion for extension of time. Dyson has up to and including 10/20/2022, to respond to Ms. Bennett's complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/28/2022. (jbh) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 09/26 8:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dyson Inc (Doan, Darby) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Thu 09/22 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dyson Inc (Doan, Darby) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Thu 09/22 2:46 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel Mize in Support of1 Notice of Removal by Dyson Inc. (jbh) |
|
2 | 2
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/22 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dyson Inc, filed by La Quita Bennett. (jbh) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 09/22 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dyson Inc from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43-CV 22-00383 Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT088388. (jbh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |