Common Construction LLC v. Jantran Inc
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian S Miller |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00174 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 4:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jantran Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Common Construction LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/16 10:38 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jantran Inc. (Janoush, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Pretrial Disclosure Sheet
Wed 03/06 11:05 AM
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Jantran Inc. (Janoush, Thomas) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Pretrial Disclosure Sheet
Fri 03/01 4:51 PM
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Common Construction LLC. (Crouch, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Tue 12/05 3:11 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JANTRAN, Inc. and by Common Construction LLC. (Crouch, James) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/21 10:16 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/1/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2023; Discovery due by 11/8/2023; Motions due by 12/4/2023; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/1/2024. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/21/2022. (ljb) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 12/21 9:21 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jantran Inc. (Janoush, Thomas) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 10/14 2:52 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/21/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/3/2023; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 4/1/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/14/2022. (ljb) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/13 2:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Jantran Inc.(Janoush, Thomas) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/26 3:55 PM
Summons Issued and returned to counsel for plaintiff as to Jantran Inc. (jap) |
||
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Fri 09/23 5:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Common Construction LLC (Crouch, James) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Order
Fri 09/23 4:08 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting2 ,3 , and4 motions for admission pro hac vice filed by Michael W. Maldonado, James A. Crouch, Jr. and Anthony J. Staines. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/23/2022. (ljb) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 09/23 11:46 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER directing the clerk to unseal documents2 ,3 and4 because counsel for plaintiff has confirmed that these documents were inadvertently labeled ex parte motions. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/23/22. (rdr) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 09/23 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re5 Deficiency Letter. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in an editable image file format. The correct document was added to docket entry5 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Deficiency Letter
Fri 09/23 10:45 AM
Deficiency Letter from the Clerk of Court re1 Complaint, notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (kdr) (jak) |
|
Att: 1 (9/23/2022) Main Document - Correct | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Order
Thu 09/22 5:02 PM
SEALED MOTION. (kdr) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Order
Thu 09/22 5:01 PM
SEALED MOTION. (kdr) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Order
Thu 09/22 5:00 PM
SEALED MOTION. (kdr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/22 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Jantran Inc, filed by Common Construction LLC. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT088391. Summons not issued.(kdr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |