Lucas v. University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00878 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 22, 2023 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chelsey Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/10 10:43 AM
ORDER adopting10 joint stipulation of dismissal; and dismissing the action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/10/2023. (jbh) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/16 5:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Chelsey Lucas. (Burks, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/29 11:13 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 8/23/2023; Motions due by 9/7/2023; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/16/2023; Status Report due by 9/7/2023. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/29/2022. (tmw) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Protective Order
Wed 11/30 11:06 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/30/2022. (jbh) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Protective Order
Mon 11/28 4:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff(Curran, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit proposed order | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 11/28 4:50 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff. Joint Report (Curran, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 10/18 8:05 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (editable image file). The correct document was added to docket entry2 based on the attached correspondence. (jak) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 10/17 9:37 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/13/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/27/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/17/2022. (tmw) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/14 4:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff.(Curran, David) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/14 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Curran on behalf of University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff (Curran, David) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/23 9:53 AM
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff filed by Chelsey Lucas. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT088393.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) |