Stecks v. Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00880 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 11:101 Bankruptcy |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2023 |
Case in other court: | USBC - E/D of AR, 4:22-ap-01053 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 22, 2023 3:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Michael E Stecks, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael E Stecks, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/28 12:44 PM
ORDER adopting12 stipulation of dismissal; and dismissing this case with prejudice with each party bearing their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2023. (jbh) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/22 3:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc. (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/18 11:20 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 8/2/2023; Motions due by 8/17/2023; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/25/2023; Status Report due by 8/17/2023. Signed at the direction of the Court on 01/18/2023. (tmw) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 01/09 8:09 AM
ORDER granting6 motion for leave to file amended complaint; and directing Mr. Stecks to file his amended complaint within 14 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/9/2023. (jbh) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 12/16 2:30 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc. (JOINT) (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 10/04 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re8 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct typographical errors and the description to "Signed at the direction of the Court" as indicated on the document. (kbc) |
||
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 10/03 3:24 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/2/2022 Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/16/2022 Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/03/2022. (tmw) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/27 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cotten Cunningham on behalf of Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/23 4:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint by Michael E Stecks, Jr.(cmn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Fri 09/23 4:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc. (cmn) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/23 4:38 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc.(cmn) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/23 4:37 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc.(cmn) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/23 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Arkansas Inc filed by Michael E Stecks, Jr.(cmn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B-1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B-3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C-1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C-2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D-1, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D-2 | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/23 4:28 PM
ORDER referring case to to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas for Jury Trial. Signed by Richard D. Taylor, United States Bankruptcy Judge on 9/23/2022.(cmn) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 BK Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 BK Case File |