California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-02169
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 24, 2022 12:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (2)
Represented By
Dacely Garcia
Law Offices Of Dacely Garcia
contact info
Defendant
Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1)
Represented By
Blake Jackson Eaton
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Vikas Bajaj
Law Office Of Vikas Bajaj, Apc
contact info
Material Witness
Adriana Gabriel-Hernandez
Represented By
Ray Antonio Estolano
Estolano Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julie A. Bauman
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2023
JUDGMENT as to Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (2), Count(s) 2, Custody of BOP for 12 months and 1 day, 3 years supervised release, $100 special assessment remitted, and fine waived. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro (jpp)
GPO Jun 12 2023
JUDGMENT as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1), Count(s) 1, Probation for 5 years, $100 assessment remitted, $5,000 JVTA waived, and fine waived. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro (jpp)

Docket last updated: 09/24/2022 1:36 AM PDT
Thursday, August 25, 2022
Arrest of Yesenia Ruby Quinones, Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (no document attached) (cdw) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones, Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez.(cdw) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Ray Antonio Estolano appointed for Adriana Gabriel-Hernandez appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones, Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez, Adriana Gabriel-Hernandez: Initial Appearance and Arraignment of MW set for 8/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (no document attached) (ekb) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
3 3 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Yesenia Ruby Quinones pending submission of the bond packet due on or before 8/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/2022. (mme) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Arraignment of Material Witness Adriana Gabriel-Hernandez held on 8/26/2022. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Ray Estolano(n/a). Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and w/10% percent cash deposit, M/W must be able to legally remain in the U.S. and follow PTS supervision. (Interpreter Alejandro Rodriguez). (CD# 8/26/2022 MSB 22-1:1:58;2:17-2:18). (Plaintiff Attorney James Redd AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) Modified on 8/30/2022 to correct hearing judge (cdw). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones(1), Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez(2) held on 8/26/2022. Financial Affidavit filed as to defendant 1 and oral proffer confirmed as to defendant 2. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1) and attorney Dacely Garcia(n/a) for Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez(2). Bond set as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $500 cash deposit; Bond paperwork due by COB 8/31/22; Abstract issued t USMS. Government oral motion to detain (Flight) as to Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez(2); Detention Hearing-RF set for 9/1/22 at 1:45pm before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Rule 5 advisement provided as to each defendant. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 9/8/22 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Arraignment set for 9/22/22 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. ) (CD# 8/26/2022 MSB 22-1:2:25-3:01). (Plaintiff Attorney James Redd AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Lee FD-S/A). (PTSO Samantha Ledesma). (aje) Modified on 8/30/2022 to correct hearing judge (cdw). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones, Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (no document attached) (aje) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
8 8 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez. (no document attached) (aje) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez(2). Detention Hearing - RF set for 9/1/2022 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (no document attached) (aje) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $500 cash deposit; Bond paperwork due by COB 8/31/22;. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/2022. (cxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Adriana Gabriel-Hernandez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/2022. (cxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/22. (aje) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER as to Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/22. (aje) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Blake Jackson Eaton appearing for Yesenia Ruby Quinones (Eaton, Blake)Attorney Blake Jackson Eaton added to party Yesenia Ruby Quinones(pty:dft) (ggv). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
9 9 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Yesenia Ruby Quinones (Eaton, Blake) (ggv). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yesenia Ruby Quinones (cxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
16 16 PS Bond Filed as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones in amount of $15,000, Receipt # CAS140219. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner (Document applicable to USA, Yesenia Ruby Quinones.) (mme) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (Garcia, Dacely) (cxl1). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): 9/8/2022 Preliminary Hearing vacated re17 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (mxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Julie A. Bauman appearing for USA. (Bauman, Julie)Attorney Julie A. Bauman added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Detention Hearing as to Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez held on 9/1/2022. USA oral motion for detention; motion is moot as to Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez. Defendant stipulates to detention and is ordered detained without prejudice. Court to prepare order. (CD# 9/1/2022 MSB 1:57-1:59). (Plaintiff Attorney James Redd, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Dacely Garcia, CJA). (no document attached) (mxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
21 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (JUDGE ONLY) as to Defendant Yesenia Ruby Quinones. On the Court's own motion, the Preliminary Hearing is reset for 9/8/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (no document attached) (mxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
22 22 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/22/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/6/2022. (mxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
23 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vikas Bajaj appearing for Yesenia Ruby Quinones(Bajaj, Vikas)Attorney Vikas Bajaj added to party Yesenia Ruby Quinones(pty:dft) (exs). [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Substitution of Attorney,
Att: 2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service
Monday, September 19, 2022
24 24 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (JUDGE AND TIME ONLY) as to Defendants Yesenia Ruby Quinones, Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez. On the court's own motion, the Arraignment (D1 & D2) and Preliminary Hearing (D1 only) is reset for 9/22/2022 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (mxl) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
25 25 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Bauman, Julie) [3:22-mj-03099-MSB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
26 26 INFORMATION as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1) count(s) 1, Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (2) count(s) 2. (jpp)
Related: [-]
27 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Arraignment on Information as to Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1) Count 1 and Gustavo Aguilar-Gonzalez (2) Count 2 held on 9/22/2022. Defendant Yesenia Ruby Quinones (1) appeared in person on bond. Not Guilty plea entered as to both defendants. Defendants waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 10/28/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (CD# 9/22/2022 AHG 22:9:06-9:17). (Plaintiff Attorney Jennifer Luce AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney David Baker, CJA S/A (Dft 1); Dacely Garcia). (als)
Related: [-]