Hamilton v. Ofc of Inspector
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00649
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cr-10910 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 30, 2022 2:29 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Office of Inspector General Austin Texas
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sylvia Hernandez
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Moresia Brown Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2022 2:29 AM CST |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
9 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Moresia Brown Hamilton 22-10910 (AS) |