Discover Property Cslty v. Blue Bell
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00487
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcd-50842 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2023 3:26 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Blue Bell Creameries USA, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Blue Bell Creameries, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
John W. Barnhill, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Greg A. Bridges
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Richard Dickson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Paul A. Ehlert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jim E. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Paul W. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
W. J. Rankin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Howard W. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Patricia I. Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Dorothy McCleod MacInerney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 11 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-50842 Affirmed] Judge: CDK, Judge: JES, Judge: JWE. Mandate issue date is 08/02/2023 [22-50842] |
Docket last updated: 07/12/2023 3:26 AM CDT |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. John W. Barnhill, Jr., Blue Bell Creameries USA, Incorporated, Blue Bell Creameries, Incorporated, Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Mr. Greg A. Bridges, Mr. Richard Dickson, Mr. Paul A. Ehlert, Mr. Howard W. Kruse, Mr. Jim E. Kruse, Mr. Paul W. Kruse, Ms. Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, Mr. W. J. Rankin and Ms. Patricia I. Ryan 22-50842 (LEF) |