Est of Tyrone Smith v. BP Expl & Prod
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcd-30604 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2023 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BP America Production Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BP, P.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Holdings, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Deepwater, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Estate of Tyrone Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/23/2023 3:20 AM CDT |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Estate of Tyrone Smith. 22-30604 (DLJ) |