Ward v. Copenhaver et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lee P Rudofsky |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00250 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 25, 2023 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bill Campbell
|
|
Defendant
Harold Copenhaver
|
|
Defendant
Simrit Kaur
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Moore
|
|
Defendant
Stan Morris
|
|
Defendant
Melissa Kathryn Morrison
|
|
Defendant
Kimberly Randall
|
|
Defendant
Larry Rogers
|
|
Defendant
Lisa Trevathan
|
|
Defendant
Wannda Turner
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Ward
744 N 2nd Street
Paragould, AR 72450 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/26 8:51 AM
ORDER directing plaintiff to provide a valid service address for Defendant Kaur within 30 days. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/26/2024. (jak) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Mon 03/25 3:36 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Pursuant to14 Order, the Clerk is directed to terminate Bill Campbell as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/25/2024. (hml) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/25 11:06 AM
ORDER directing Mr. Ward to immediately file a request for the appointment of pro bono counsel in this case, if he wants to pursue that option; and directing the Clerk to prepare and deliver summonses for the Defendants, along with a copy of the Amended Complaint and this Order, to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security, for service at the addresses provided in the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/25/2024. (ldb) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Harold Copenhaver, Carol Duncan, Jeffrey Moore, Stan Morris, Melissa Kathryn Morrison, Kimberly Randall, Larry Rogers, Lisa Trevathan, Wannda Turner and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 11/27 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Errata to10 First Amended Complaint and NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen Ward. (cmn) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/14 3:44 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Stephen Ward re 11 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Wed 11/01 2:35 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/1/2023.(jak) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 10/17 11:39 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will now proceed to screen the Amended Complaint that Mr. Ward filed on 10/12/2023. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 10/17/2023. (cjd) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 10/12 3:19 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stephen Ward. No Summons issued. (wbb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/21 11:07 AM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 01/17 10:17 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting5 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/17/2023. (jwp) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 01/17 9:33 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order denying without prejudice3 Plaintiff's application for an order authorizing an interlocutory appeal. This application is premature. The Court has not issued any orders yet, so there is nothing that could possibly be appealed at this time. Once the Court issues an Order, Mr. Ward may renew his application if he chooses to do so. But he is warned that interlocutory appeals are disfavored and rarely granted. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/17/2023. (jwp) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Errata
Mon 10/17 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA to First Amended Complaint by Stephen Ward. (wbb) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 10/03 9:35 AM
MOTION to Amend2 Complaint filed by Stephen Ward.(wbb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
4 | 4
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 10/03 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re3 MOTION for Interlocutory Decision. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (missing signature). The correct document was added to docket entry3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
16
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 09/26 1:21 PM
APPLICATION for an Interlocutory Decision filed by Stephen Ward. (wbb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/26 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stephen Ward.(wbb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 09/26 1:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen Ward. (wbb) |