Shelton v. Adams
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | Patricia S Harris |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2024 |
Defendant
Monica R Adams
|
|
Plaintiff
Clifton London
|
|
Plaintiff
Clifton Wayne Shelton
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
65 | 65
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Thu 03/07 4:45 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh) |
|
64 | 64
order
Judgment 1983
Thu 03/07 4:43 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the63 Order entered on this date, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The relief requested is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/7/2024. (jbh) |
|
63 | 63
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 03/07 4:41 PM
ORDER adopting62 Proposed Findings and Recommendation in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing Mr. Shelton's1 complaint and5 amended complaint without prejudice; and finding33 ,40 ,41 ,55 all pending motions moot. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/7/2024. (jbh) |