Turnbough v. Payne
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lee P Rudofsky |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00883 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2022 |
Defendant
Dexter Payne
|
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Don Turnbough
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment 1983
Tue 12/27 3:58 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with6 Order, all claims brought in this case are dismissed without prejudice. This case is closed. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal of this Judgment or any related Orders would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/27/2022. (ldb) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 12/27 3:54 PM
ORDER approving and adopting3 Recommendation in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Turnbough's claims; entering Judgment accordingly and closing this case; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal of this Order or the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/27/2022. (ldb) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 10/07 1:39 PM
OBJECTION to3 Report and Recommendations by Jimmy Don Turnbough. (kdr) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 10/07 1:29 PM
AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jimmy Don Turnbough Related document:2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jimmy Don Turnbough.(kdr) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 09/27 3:26 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Mr. Turnbough's2 Petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed without prejudice so that he may seek authorization from the Eighth Circuit to file a successive habeas petition; Mr. Turnbough's1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied as moot; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/27/22. (tjb) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 09/26 3:30 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jimmy Don Turnbough. (ldb) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 09/26 3:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Don Turnbough. (ldb) |