USA v. Paul et al
Maryland District Court | |
Case #: | 8:22-cr-00231 |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 3:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jalen Craig McMillan (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archie Arnold Paul (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Fitzgerald Washington (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tiffany Rainel Williams (2)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 18 2024
MEMORANDUM to counsel regarding trial procedure as to Jalen Craig McMillan. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/18/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 10/16/2023 10:59 AM EDT |