Western Union Company v. Ace American Insurance Company
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00127
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01305 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 27, 2023 1:48 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
THE WESTERN UNION COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/27/2023 1:48 AM MST |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
[10942824] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/23/2022. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/07/2022 for The Western Union Company. Notice of appearance due on 10/07/2022 for ACE American Insurance Company. 22-1305 | ||
Att: 1 24 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |