Montgomery v. Anderson, et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-03191
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01306 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 31, 2022 1:23 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
TORI ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT BAKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIAM MONTGOMERY
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 29 2022
[10965979] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Tymkovich, Bacharach and Moritz. [22-1306] |
Docket last updated: 12/31/2022 1:23 AM MST |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
[10942836] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/23/2022. Notice of appearance due on 10/07/2022 for Tori Anderson and Scott Baker, and Notice of appearance due on 10/24/2022 for William Montgomery. Fee or ifp forms due 10/24/2022 for William Montgomery. 22-1306 | ||
Att: 1 14 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se | ||
2 pgs [10942986] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant shall show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiciton due to untimely filing of the notice of appeal. Response due on 10/14/2022 for William Montgomery 22-1306 See order for details. |