Livingstone v. Livingstone
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00472
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01308 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2023 1:19 AM MST |
Petitioner - Appellant
CALLUM JOSEPH LIVINGSTONE
|
Represented By
|
Respondent - Appellee
EMERALD MACKENZIE LIVINGSTONE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 08 2023
[11050831] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished. Judges Bacharach, Baldock and Murphy (author). Mandate to issue. [22-1308, 22-1343] |
Docket last updated: 12/12/2023 1:19 AM MST |
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
[10943214] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/26/2022. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 10/11/2022 for Callum Joseph Livingstone. Notice of appearance due on 10/11/2022 for Emerald Mackenzie Livingstone. 22-1308 | ||
Att: 1 21 pgs Preliminary ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |