Arroyo, et al v. Hall, et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-01687
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01309 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 2:18 AM MDT |
Defendant
ANDREW PRIVETT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY HOLCOMB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DUSTIN ROSS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHAD WEISE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ALEXANDER HALL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JOSHUA MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSE ARROYO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HEATHER BOEHM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMUEL CORDO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
AMBER MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/27/2022 2:18 AM MDT |
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
[10943223] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/26/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due 10/11/2022 for Alexander Hall and Joshua Moore. Notice of appearance due on 10/11/2022 for Jose Arroyo, Heather Boehm, Samuel Cordo, and Amber Miller. 22-1309 | ||
Att: 1 23 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |