Arroyo, et al v. Holcomb, et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-01687
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01310 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 2:16 AM MDT |
Defendant
ALEXANDER HALL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOSHUA MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANDREW PRIVETT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
TIMOTHY HOLCOMB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DUSTIN ROSS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
CHAD WEISE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSE ARROYO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HEATHER BOEHM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMUEL CORDO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
AMBER MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/27/2022 2:16 AM MDT |
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
[10943222] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/26/2022. Docketing statement due 10/11/2022 for Timothy Holcomb, Dustin Ross and Chad Weise. Transcript order form due 10/11/2022 for Timothy Holcomb, Dustin Ross and Chad Weise. Notice of appearance due on 10/11/2022 for Jose Arroyo, Heather Boehm, Samuel Cordo, Timothy Holcomb, Amber Miller, Dustin Ross and Chad Weise 22-1310 | ||
Att: 1 23 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |