Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-11640

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:22-ap-00187
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering
Lee Building University of Maryland
College Park, MD 20742
Represented By
University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirin Giselle Smith
3616 Fords Lane apt F
Baltimore, MD 21215
Represented By
Robert Grossbart
Grossbart, Portney & Rosenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, January 25, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/25 2:00 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Kirin Giselle Smith. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/25 3:31 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-187 Closed. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
court Disposition Without Hearing - CDP (Auto-Docket) Wed 01/03 9:26 AM
Disposition Without Hearing: re:7 Amended Complaint by Robert Grossbart on behalf of Kirin Giselle Smith against University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering. AFFIDAVIT OF SUMMONS SERVICE EXECUTED HAS NOT BEEN FILED. Related [+] (Yalley, Joyce)
Related: [-] 7 Support Document
Friday, November 10, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sat 11/11 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 11/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 order Withdraw As Attorney Wed 11/08 10:42 AM
Order Denying Motion To Withdraw As Attorney- For Lack Of Evidence Of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-4. Related [+]. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Withdraw Robert N. Grossbart and Grossbart, Portney and Rosenberg, P.A. as Attorney for Plaintiff Krin Giselle Smith filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Friday, November 03, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sat 11/04 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Summons Issued
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
14 14 court Summons Issued Wed 11/01 12:38 PM
Summons Re-issued on University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering Date Issued 11/1/2023, Answer Due 12/1/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/3/2024 at 02:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 7 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Sunday, October 01, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Mon 10/02 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Court Instruction
Friday, September 29, 2023
12 12 court Court Instruction Fri 09/29 2:31 PM
Court Instruction- No Evidence Of Compliance With Local BankruptcyRule 9010-4 Or That Plaintiff Has Requested Withdrawal Of Counsel. Counsel May File A Line Addressing These Deficiencies Within Fourteen (14) Days Of This Entry, Failing Which The Court May Rule On The Motion Without Further Notice. Related [+]. Responses due by 9/13/2023. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
11 11 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 09/26 5:15 PM
Motion to Withdraw Robert N. Grossbart and Grossbart, Portney and Rosenberg, P.A. as Attorney for Plaintiff Krin Giselle Smith Filed by Kirin Giselle Smith. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 01, 2023
10 10 misc Line Fri 09/01 4:28 PM
Line Requesting Reissue of Summons on behalf of Kirin Giselle Smith Filed by Robert Grossbart Related [+]. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Friday, June 09, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sat 06/10 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Issued
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 court Summons Issued Wed 06/07 9:31 AM
Summons Reissued on University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering Date Issued 6/7/2023, Answer Due 7/7/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 02:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Thursday, December 29, 2022
7 7 apmisc Support Document Thu 12/29 10:39 AM
Support Document Filed by Robert Grossbart Related [+]. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith,6 Deficiency Notice
utility Deficiency Satisfied Thu 12/29 1:52 PM
Deficiency Satisfied Related [+]. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith,6 Deficiency Notice
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
6 6 court Deficiency Notice Tue 12/27 10:49 AM
Deficiency Notice Related [+]. (missing the red-lined version per LBR 7015-1 ) Cured Pleading due by 1/10/2023. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Saturday, December 24, 2022
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 12/24 8:16 AM
Amended Complaint by Robert Grossbart on behalf of Kirin Giselle Smith against University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering. Related [+]. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Sunday, October 02, 2022
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Mon 10/03 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Fri 09/30 5:46 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering 9/30/2022. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 09/30 2:09 PM
Summons Issued on University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering Date Issued 9/30/2022, Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/5/2022 at 02:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Horning, Kelly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kirin Giselle Smith
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Tue 09/27 11:09 AM
Adversary case 22-00187 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint by Robert Grossbart on behalf of Kirin Giselle Smith against University of Maryland Student Financial Services and Cashiering. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Grossbart, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D