Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-30854

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary Ann Whipple
Case #: 3:22-ap-03039
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kenneth Paul Sharp
1544 Oak Harbor Rd
Fremont, OH 43420
Represented By
Kenneth Paul Sharp
contact info
Plaintiff
Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC
1400 W. State St.
Fremont, OH 43420
Represented By
Scott A. Ciolek
Scott Ciolek
contact info

GPO Jun 03 2024
Memorandum of Decision and Order signed on 6/3/2024. The court finds Defendants Second Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. # 19 is GRANTED in part as follows: 1. Partial Summary Judgment is hereby entered in Defendants favor on Plaintiffs claims brought under §§ 523(a)(2), (a)(4) and (a)(6) based on his vicarious liability for the acts of Patty Sharp. Defendants Second Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. # 19 is otherwise DENIED, with the following disputed matters remaining to be determined: 1. Efficacy of service of the State Court complaint on Defendant. 2. Application of issue preclusion to the State Court judgment and the extent to which this court is bound thereby. 3. Defendants liability for his own alleged misconduct in aiding and abetting or conspiring with Patty Sharp under the elements of each of §§ 523(a)(2), (a)(4) and (a)(6). (RE: 19 Amended Motion). A further Pretrial Scheduling Conference will be set by separate Order of the Court. (mknei crt)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 09/04 9:03 AM
Disposition of Adversary 3:22-ap-3039 (mknei)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/04 9:17 AM
Adversary Case 3:22-ap-3039 Closed (mknei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
42 42 BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/29 12:09 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41
Monday, August 26, 2024
41 41 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/26 9:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (RE #39 ) Signed on 8/26/2024. (mknei crt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 24, 2024
40 40 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sun 08/25 12:06 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38
Friday, August 23, 2024
39 39 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/23 2:40 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC (Ciolek, Scott aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
38 38 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Thu 08/22 3:41 PM
Sixth Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 8/22/2024. Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days to file a Motion to Dismiss. Related [+]. (mknei crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
37 37 court Proceeding Memo Thu 08/22 12:47 PM
Proceeding Memo: Further Pretrial held. Plaintiff to file Motion to Dismiss Adversary proceeding within 14 days. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 19, 2024
36 36 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sat 07/20 12:15 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
35 35 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Wed 07/17 4:33 PM
Fifth Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 7/17/2024 Related [+]. Parties may appear in person or by telephone by calling the Court's conference line no less than 5 minutes prior to the Further Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. (mknei crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
34 34 court Proceeding Memo Wed 07/17 10:31 AM
Proceeding Memo: Further Pretrial on Complaint held. Adjourned to 8/22/24 at 10:30 am. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, June 28, 2024
33 33 BNC Notice of Order to Continue Hearing Sat 06/29 12:17 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Continue Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
32 32 order Continue Hearing Wed 06/26 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On (RE31 ) Related [+] Signed on 6/26/2024. Parties may appear in person or by telephone by calling the Court's conference line no less than 5 minutes prior to the Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2024 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. (mknei crt). Related document(s)26 Opinion and Order. Modified on 6/26/2024 to add link to Doc #26 that was not available during the docketing process (mknei)
Related: [-] Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment
Monday, June 24, 2024
31 31 motion Continue Hearing Mon 06/24 4:34 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On 6/27/24 Filed by Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC Related [+] (Ciolek, Scott aty). Related document(s)19 Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kenneth Paul Sharp,26 Opinion and Order. Modified on 6/24/2024 to correct link (mknei)
Related: [-] 27 Set Hearing (PDF)
30 30 motion Continue Hearing Mon 06/24 2:58 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On 6/27/2024 Filed by Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC Related [+] (Ciolek, Scott aty). Related document(s)19 Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kenneth Paul Sharp,26 Opinion and Order. Modified on 6/24/2024 to correct links (mknei). Modified on 6/24/2024 (mknei)
Related: [-] 27 Set Hearing (PDF)
Thursday, June 06, 2024
29 29 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Fri 06/07 12:13 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
28 28 BNC Notice of Opinion and Order Thu 06/06 12:12 AM
Notice of Opinion and Order w/ Certificate of Service Related [+] Notice Date 06/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
27 27 order Set Hearing (PDF) Tue 06/04 8:52 AM
Order Scheduling Further Pretrial Conference signed on 6/4/2024 Related [+]. Parties may appear in person or by telephone by calling the Court's conference line no less than 5 minutes prior to the Further Pretrial Conference scheduled for 6/27/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. (mknei crt)
Related: [-] 19 Amended Motion,26 Opinion and Order
Monday, June 03, 2024
26 26 17 pgs order Opinion and Order (PDF) Mon 06/03 4:19 PM
Memorandum of Decision and Order signed on 6/3/2024. The court finds Defendants Second Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. # 19 is GRANTED in part as follows: 1. Partial Summary Judgment is hereby entered in Defendants favor on Plaintiffs claims brought under §§ 523(a)(2), (a)(4) and (a)(6) based on his vicarious liability for the acts of Patty Sharp. Defendants Second Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. # 19 is otherwise DENIED, with the following disputed matters remaining to be determined: 1. Efficacy of service of the State Court complaint on Defendant. 2. Application of issue preclusion to the State Court judgment and the extent to which this court is bound thereby. 3. Defendants liability for his own alleged misconduct in aiding and abetting or conspiring with Patty Sharp under the elements of each of §§ 523(a)(2), (a)(4) and (a)(6). Related [+]. A further Pretrial Scheduling Conference will be set by separate Order of the Court. (mknei crt)
Related: [-] 19 Amended Motion
Friday, July 28, 2023
25 25 court Support Document Fri 07/28 3:59 PM
Support Document Exhibit A Filed by Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC Related [+]. (Ciolek, Scott aty)
Related: [-] 24
24 24 answer Response Fri 07/28 3:17 PM
Response to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC Related [+] (Ciolek, Scott aty)
Related: [-] 19 Amended Motion
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit
Friday, May 19, 2023
23 23 court Returned Mail Fri 05/19 2:27 PM
Returned Mail Notice from BNC to court rec'd via email on 5/19/2023. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 13, 2023
22 22 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sun 05/14 12:10 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, May 11, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Thu 05/11 3:09 PM
Fourth Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 5/11/2023. Discovery to be completed by July 7, 2023. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Amended Motion due July 28, 2023. Any Reply by Plaintiff is due August 11, 2023. (mknei crt). Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC. Modified on 5/11/2023 to add link (mknei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
20 20 court Proceeding Memo Wed 05/10 2:57 PM
Proceeding Memo: Further Pretrial Conference held. Discovery cut off 7/7/23. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Amended Motion doc #18 due 7/28/23. Any Reply by Plaintiff due by 8/11/23. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC
Friday, May 05, 2023
19 19 motion Amended Motion Fri 05/05 2:10 PM
Amended Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Kenneth Paul Sharp Related [+] (Ollom, Tinisha aty)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,12 Amended Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
Sunday, April 23, 2023
18 18 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Mon 04/24 12:10 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, April 21, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Fri 04/21 10:21 AM
Third Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 4/21/2023 Related [+]. Defendant to file an Amended Motion, if any, by May 5, 2023. Further Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. Parties may appear by telephone by calling the conference line no less than 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. (mknei crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 20, 2023
16 16 court Proceeding Memo Thu 04/20 1:10 PM
Proceeding Memo; Further Pretrial held. Adjourned to 5/10/23 at 11:00 am. Defendant to file a further Amended Motion (doc #12) if any by 5/5/23 Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, December 10, 2022
15 15 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sun 12/11 12:12 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, December 08, 2022
14 14 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Thu 12/08 4:36 PM
Second Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 12/8/2022 Related [+]. The Hearing will be held telephonically. Parties may call the conference line no less than 5 minutes prior to the Further Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. Deadline to complete discovery is 4/7/2023. (mknei crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
13 13 court Proceeding Memo Thu 12/08 12:04 PM
Proceeding Memo: Further Pretrial held. Adjourned to 4/20/23 at 10:30 am. 1) Response to pending MFSJ at Doc. # 12 to be set upon further order of the court. 2) No further case management schedule set at this time. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
12 12 motion Amended Motion Tue 12/06 1:31 PM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kenneth Paul Sharp Related [+] (Ollom, Tinisha aty)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
11 11 court Support Document Wed 11/09 12:28 PM
Support Document Filed by Kenneth Paul Sharp Related [+]. (Ollom, Tinisha aty)
Related: [-] 5
Sunday, November 06, 2022
10 10 BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sun 11/06 11:11 PM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, November 04, 2022
9 9 order Scheduling Order (PDF) Fri 11/04 2:46 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order signed on 11/4/2022. Plaintiff and Defendant shall file supplements to their respective pleadings to indicate consent or lack thereof to final order by the Bankruptcy Court by November 10, 2022. The Hearing will be held telephonically. Parties may call the conference line no less than 5 minutes prior to the Further Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. (mknei crt)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Support Document Fri 11/04 12:52 PM
Support Document re: Rule 7008 Filed by Plaintiff Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC Related [+]. (Ciolek, Scott aty)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 03, 2022
7 7 court Proceeding Memo Thu 11/03 2:19 PM
Proceeding Memo: Initial Pretrial Conf held. Adjourned to 12/8/22. 1) Plaintiff and Defendant to file supplements to pleadings to indicate consent or lack thereof to final orders by Bankruptcy Court. Due w/i 7 days. 2) No further case management schedule set at this time pending Further Pretrial Conf. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
6 6 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/25 2:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kenneth Paul Sharp (Ollom, Tinisha aty)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/25 1:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Kenneth Paul Sharp. (Ollom, Tinisha aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A/Affidavit
4 4 answer Response Tue 10/25 11:48 AM
Response to Adversary Complaint Filed by Kenneth Paul Sharp Related [+] (Ollom, Tinisha aty) Modified on 10/25/2022 (mknei)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit
utility Notice Requiring Corrective Document Tue 10/25 12:36 PM
NOTICE REQUIRING CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT: Incorrect ECF docket code selected. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 4 Response
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 09/29 12:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kenneth Paul Sharp 9/29/2022 (Ciolek, Scott aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 09/27 3:38 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant Kenneth Paul Sharp - Answer due 10/27/2022. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 10:53 AM
Adversary case 22-03039 Complaint by Kuns Northcoast Security Center LLC against Kenneth Paul Sharp. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny),68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) (Ciolek, Scott aty)
Related: [-]