Johnson-Gruver v. Select Home Warranty LLC
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00252 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 6:12 PM CDT |
Defendant
Select Home Warranty LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Virginia Johnson-Gruver
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 20 2022
JUDGMENT: Johnson-Gruver's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2022. (ldb) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Wed 12/21 8:22 AM
JUDGMENT: Johnson-Gruver's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2022. (ldb) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 12/21 8:12 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Notice of dismissal, Doc. 5 , appreciated. The Court will dismiss Johnson-Gruver's complaint without prejudice. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2022. (slb) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 12/20 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Virginia Johnson-Gruver (Paronich, Anthony) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/07 8:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virginia Johnson-Gruver. Select Home Warranty LLC served on 10/5/2022. (Paronich, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/29 11:48 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. 2 , granted. Anthony Paronich is admitted pro hac vice . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2022. (slb) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/28 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Anthony Paronich. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4360378. Filed by Virginia Johnson-Gruver (Ryburn, Jason) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/27 9:50 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, STATUTORY DAMAGES, AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF with Jury Demand filed by Virginia Johnson-Gruver against Select Home Warranty LLC. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT088427.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (ldb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |