Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jerome T Kearney
Referred: Jerome T Kearney
Case #: 4:22-cv-00886
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2022
Terminated:Feb 07, 2023
Defendant
Artisha Grant
Defendant
Denise Robinson
Defendant
Dennis Parker
Defendant
Mariah Daniels
Defendant
Shaquita McFadden
Plaintiff
Michael Hall

GPO Sep 30 2022
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within thirty days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/2022. (ldb) (Docket text modified on 10/3/2022 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
GPO Jan 06 2023
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days of this Order, a Response to 17 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/6/2023. (ldb)
GPO Feb 07 2023
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of exhaustion; dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants; dismissing 1-1 Complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/2023. (ldb)
GPO Feb 07 2023
JUDGMENT: Based on 22 Order, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal of that Order and this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/2023. (ldb)

Docket last updated: 12/01/2023 11:59 PM CST
Monday, May 15, 2023
39 39 misc Mail Returned Mon 05/15 10:58 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael Hall re38 Order. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
38 38 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Mon 05/01 2:58 PM
ORDER directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $505 appellate filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/1/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
37 37 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 04/28 2:38 PM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 4/28/2023 as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Hall. (jbh)
Related: [-]
36 36 appeal USCA Judgment Fri 04/28 2:34 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Hall: This appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. The full $505 appellate and docketing fees are assessed against the appellant. The court remands the collection of those fees to the district court. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
35 35 misc Mail Returned Thu 04/06 10:14 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael Hall re25 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
34 34 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/16 10:50 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael Hall re Notice of Docket Correction re27 Order. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
33 33 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/10 10:20 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael Hall re27 Order,28 Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
32 32 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/06 9:48 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael Hall re 26 Notice of Appeal. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
31 31 appeal USCA Order Wed 03/01 10:10 AM
ORDER of USCA as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Hall: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (jbh)
Related: [-]
30 30 appeal USCA Order Wed 03/01 10:03 AM
ORDER of USCA as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Hall: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 3/29/2023, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (jbh)
Related: [-]
29 29 appeal USCA Docketing Letter Wed 03/01 9:57 AM
USCA Docketing Letter as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Hall. USCA Case Number 23-1398 (jbh)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 03/01 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re27 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the signature date and file date as 2/27/2023 as marked on the document.(cmn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
28 28 appeal Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement Tue 02/28 10:56 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 26 Notice of Appeal re22 Order,23 Judgment. (jbh)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/28 10:48 AM
ORDER denying25 Motion For Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall either pay to this Court the full $505.00 filing and docketing fees for filing an appeal or file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit an application to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Plaintiff is directed to file any future documents or pleadings in connection with his appeal directly with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 02/24 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to22 Order and23 Judgment, by Michael Hall. (No separate document filed; see docket entry25 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.) (fcd)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/24 1:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Michael Hall. (fcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
24 24 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Tue 02/07 3:55 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Judgment 1983 Tue 02/07 3:54 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on22 Order, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal of that Order and this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
22 22 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 02/07 3:52 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of exhaustion; dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants; dismissing1 -1 Complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
21 21 order Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tue 01/17 3:12 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 01/17/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/06 4:02 PM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days of this Order, a Response to17 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/6/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
19 19 misc Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) Thu 01/05 11:21 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re17 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mariah Daniels, Artisha Grant, Shaquita McFadden, Dennis Parker, Denise Robinson.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit No. A - Affidavit of Sgt. Clark,
Att: 2 Exhibit No. A1 - Arrest & Booking,
Att: 3 Exhibit No. A2 - Requests & Grievances,
Att: 4 Exhibit No. A5 - Policies & Procedures
18 18 brief Brief in Support Thu 01/05 11:20 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re17 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies filed by Mariah Daniels, Artisha Grant, Shaquita McFadden, Dennis Parker, Denise Robinson. (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Thu 01/05 11:19 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by Mariah Daniels, Artisha Grant, Shaquita McFadden, Dennis Parker, Denise Robinson (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
16 16 notice Consent Notice Mon 12/12 8:06 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to the parties. (lmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/01 8:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Artisha Grant served on 11/7/2022. (kth)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/01 8:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dennis Parker served on 11/7/2022. (kth)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/01 8:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Mariah Daniels served on 11/7/2022. (kth)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/01 8:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Denise Robinson served on 11/7/2022. (kth)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/01 8:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Shaquita McFadden served on 11/7/2022. (kth)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/18 2:46 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Defendants McFadden, Robinson, Daniels, Parker, and Grant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/18/2022. (ldb)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/18 2:45 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall complete discovery on or before 05/17/2023 and file any dispositive motions on or before 06/17/2023. A Motion based on failure to exhaust must be filed by 01/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/18/2022. (lmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/17 11:31 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Daniels, Grant, McFadden, Parker, Robinson.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/17 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dugger on behalf of Daniels, Grant, McFadden, Parker, Robinson (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
service Summons Issued Fri 10/28 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Daniels, Grant, McFadden, Parker, Robinson and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
6 6 5 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Thu 10/27 4:04 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Center; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare Summonses for Defendants Shaquita McFadden, Denise Robinson, Mariah Daniels, Dennis Parker, and Artisha Grant; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the1 -1 Complaint, Summons, and this Order on Defendants McFadden, Robinson, Daniels, Parker, and Grant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/27/2022. (ldb)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/27 3:55 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/27/2022. (lmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/26 10:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Hall. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/30 8:21 AM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within thirty days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/2022. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
2 2 utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 09/28 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (incorrect Judge information) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to1 docket entry and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (cmn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Michael Hall.(kdr)
Related: [-]