Bradley v. McFadden et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jerome T Kearney |
Referred: | Jerome T Kearney |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00887 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2023 |
Defendant
Artisha Grant
|
|
Defendant
Denise Robinson
|
|
Defendant
Dennis Parker
|
|
Defendant
Mariah Daniels
|
|
Defendant
Shaquita McFadden
|
|
Plaintiff
Randy Bradley
|
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 03/08 10:28 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Randy Bradley re25 Order,26 Judgment,27 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Tue 02/07 10:00 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb) |
|
26 | 26
order
Judgment 1983
Tue 02/07 9:58 AM
JUDGMENT: Based on25 Order, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal of that Order and this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/2023. (ldb) |
|
25 | 25
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 02/07 9:54 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of exhaustion; dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants; dismissing, without prejudice,1 -2 Complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/2023. (ldb) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 01/30 3:09 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Randy Bradley re22 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (fjg) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 01/18 1:33 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Randy Bradley re21 Order. (fjg) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/17 2:01 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/17/2023. (ldb) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/05 3:58 PM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days of the entry of the Order, a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/5/2023. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1)
Tue 01/03 2:11 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re18 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mariah Daniels, Artisha Grant, Shaquita McFadden, Dennis Parker, Denise Robinson.(Dugger, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit No. A - Affidavit of Sgt. Clark, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit No.A1 - Arrest & Booking, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit No. A2 - Requests & Grievances, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit No. A4 - Policies & Procedures | ||
19 | 19
brief
Brief in Support
Tue 01/03 2:10 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re18 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies filed by Mariah Daniels, Artisha Grant, Shaquita McFadden, Dennis Parker, Denise Robinson. (Dugger, Melissa) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 01/03 2:09 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by Mariah Daniels, Artisha Grant, Shaquita McFadden, Dennis Parker, Denise Robinson (Dugger, Melissa) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/21 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dennis Parker served on 10/31/2022. (fjg) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/21 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Artisha Grant served on 10/31/2022. (fjg) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/21 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Mariah Daniels served on 10/31/2022. (fjg) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/21 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Denise Robinson served on 10/31/2022. (fjg) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/21 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Shaquita McFadden served on 10/31/2022. (fjg) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/16 4:39 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Defendants McFadden, Robinson, Daniels, Parker, and Grant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/16/2022. (ldb) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/16 4:19 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall complete discovery on or before 05/15/2023 and file any dispositive motions on or before 06/15/2023. A Motion based on failure to exhaust must be filed by 01/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/16/2022. (lmc) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Consent Notice
Wed 11/16 10:07 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to the parties. (lmc) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/15 10:19 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Daniels, Grant, McFadden, Parker, Robinson.(Dugger, Melissa) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/15 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dugger on behalf of Daniels, Grant, McFadden, Parker, Robinson (Dugger, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 10/25 8:53 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Center; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare Summonses for Defendants Shaquita McFadden, Denise Robinson, Mariah Daniels, Dennis Parker, and Artisha Grant; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of1 -2 Complaint, Summons, and this Order on Defendants McFadden, Robinson, Daniels, Parker, and Grant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/25/2022. (ldb) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/25 8:51 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/25/2022. (lmc) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/25 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Daniels, Grant, McFadden, Parker, Robinson and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb) |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 10/20 4:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Bradley. (ldb) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/30 8:24 AM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within thirty days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/2022. (ldb) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Wed 09/28 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Complaint and2 Notice of Docket Correction. CORRECTION: The original document for docket entry1 was attached in error (wrong case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. The docket text for docket entry2 was modified to indicate the Notice of Docket Correction was filed in error. (jak) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Wed 09/28 9:45 AM
DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 9/28/2022 to indicate the notice of docket correction was filed in error) (jak) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/27 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Randy Bradley.(kdr) |