David Wilson v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Original Case: 2:22-cv-01647
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02797 |
Type | civil / united states as party / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 06, 2023 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JUSTICE STUART RABNER, New Jersey Supreme Court Chief
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAMDEN CITY FIRE CHIEF MICHAEL HARPER
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAMDEN COUNTY POLICE CHIEF GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAMDEN CITY MAYOR VIC CARSTARPHEN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
TRENTON FIRE COMMISSIONER KENNETH S DOUGLAS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
TRENTON POLICE COMMISSIONER STEVE WILSON
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NEW JERSEY LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR SHEILA Y. OLIVER
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
USA DISTRICT COURT JUDGE MICHAEL A. SHIPP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
USA SUPREME COURT CHIEF JUSTICE JOHN ROBERTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
VICE PRESIDENT KAMALA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TRENTON MUNICIPAL COURT CHIEF MARC MCKITHEN
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
STEVE WILSON
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
MICHAEL A. SHIPP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
JOHN ROBERTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
STUART RABNER
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
SHEILA Y. OLIVER
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
MARC MCKITHEN
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
KAMALA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
MICHAEL HARPER
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
KENNETH S DOUGLAS
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
VIC CARSTARPHEN
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID ALLEN WILSON
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 05 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: HARDIMAN, PORTER and FREEMAN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 4. |
Docket last updated: 04/06/2023 4:51 AM EDT |
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. David Allen Wilson in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01647. (DW) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs District Court Opinion_092022 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order_092022 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case_ Caption | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |