Original Case: 5:21-cv-04207

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cr-30611
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Nov 10, 2022
Last checked: Friday Nov 11, 2022 2:45 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By
Marshall Perkins
Pettiette, Armand, Dunkelman, Woodley, Byrd & Cromwell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Deon Morris, L.L.P.
Represented By
Ashley E. Morris
Dean Morris, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kareem Abdul Johnson
Represented By
Kareem Abdul Johnson
Caddo Correction Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/11/2022 2:45 AM CST
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Kareem Abdul Johnson 22-30611 (WMJ)
Related: [-]