Rhea v. Floyd et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | Joe J Volpe |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00255 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2023 |
Defendant
Cameron
|
|
Defendant
Dane Barnum
|
|
Defendant
Felisha Rowland
|
|
Defendant
James Floyd
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Rhea
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 03/13 1:05 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Donald Rhea re4 Order,5 Judgment,6 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Appellate Filing Fee Notice
Mon 02/13 8:48 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Judgment 1983
Mon 02/13 8:22 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to4 Order,1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/13/2023. (ldb) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 02/13 8:19 AM
ORDER approving and adopting3 Recommended Disposition; dismissing1 Complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/13/2023. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 11/08 12:56 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice due to a lack of prosecution, and this case be closed1 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/8/2022. (lej) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/03 4:22 PM
ORDER that the Clerk shall mail Plaintiff an IFP Application and a Calculation Sheet. Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $402 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/3/2022. (lej) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/28 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald Rhea.(kdr) |