Kosel v. Social Security Administration
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | J Thomas Ray |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00892 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2023 |
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 03/06 8:38 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the5 Order entered this date, plaintiff Virginia Kosel's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/6/2023. (jbh) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 03/06 8:35 AM
ORDER adopting4 Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's finding in all respects; and dismissing2 complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/6/2023. (jbh) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 11/02 11:47 AM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that2 Complaint filed by Virginia Kosel be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/2/2022. (csf) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 09/30 11:19 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Ms. Kosel wishes to proceed with this action, then within 30 days of issuance of this Order, she must submit a new complete IFP Motion or pay the $402 filing and administrative fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/30/2022. (csf) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/28 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Virginia Kosel. (jbh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 09/28 11:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Virginia Kosel. (jbh) |